McAliley v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Carrie McAliley
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv81573
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 1/12/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020., Expert Discovery due by 8/12/2020., Fact Discovery due by 7/10/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2020., Mediation Deadline 10/9/2020., In Limine Motions due by 12/18/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2020., Motions due by 12/18/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/18/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified on 12/26/2019 (pcs).
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Derrevere, Jon)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/3/2020 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12161853, filed by Target Corporation. No Motion to Dismiss has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Target's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plt's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sept. 18, 2018 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - April 26, 2016 Demand Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Jon D. Derrevere, Esquire, #7 Exhibit 7 - Copies of all Process, Pleadings and other Papers filed in State Court, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Derrevere, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAliley v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie McAliley
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jon Dale Derrevere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?