Fernandez v. CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC
Plaintiff: Nelson Fernandez
Defendant: CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81587
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nelson Fernandez. CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Hannah, Roderick)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order (Verified Regarding Prior ADA Cases) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Nelson Fernandez (Hannah, Roderick)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC. (mee)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12173700, filed by Nelson Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLUB MONACO U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Fernandez
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?