Mantz v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Annie Mantz
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 9:2019cv81599
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Annie Mantz (cds)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DIRECTING CLERKS OFFICE TO PREPARE SUMMONSES AND SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL. Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (pcs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Annie Mantz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(pcs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Annie Mantz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(pcs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #3 Exhibit) (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mantz v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Mantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?