Village Professional Park Property Owners Association, Inc. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Village Professional Park Property Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Rene A Aguilera, American Express Centurion Bank and United States of America
Case Number: 9:2019cv81726
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Village Professional Park Property Owners Association, Inc. (Arsali, Anthony)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America. (Swietlik, Amanda)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020., All Discovery due by 5/18/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/15/2020., Motions due by 6/15/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/20/2020.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Scheduling Order, and Setting Trial Date. ( Calendar Call set for 8/12/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time. Defendant United States of America removed this lawsuit to this Court on December 26, 2019, making United States' response to the Complaint due by January 2, 2020. (DE #1 ). In the present Motion, Defendant United States requests that this deadline be extended to January 24, 2020 so that it may "obtain files and the views of the affected agency." (DE #4 at 2). I find good cause to grant the requested extension; Defendant United States shall file its answer by January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/30/2019. (jdr)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carol Koehler Ide is RELIEVED from further representation of Defendant United States in this matter. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer until January 24, 2020 by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swietlik, Amanda)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Substitution of Counsel by Amanda J. Swietlik for / by United States of America. Attorney Amanda J. Swietlik added to party United States of America(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Swietlik, Amanda)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Foreclosure) Filing fee $400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ide, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village Professional Park Property Owners Association, Inc. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene A Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carol Koehler Ide
Represented By: Amanda J. Swietlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Professional Park Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Arash Arsali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?