Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc. v. Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc.
Defendant: Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc., Bill Burckhart, Edward Chan, Patricia Aguiar and Fabio D'Ascola
Case Number: 9:2019mc80309
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO PARTIES' NOTICE OF ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY IN PRIMARY ACTION re #5 Notice. In light of Judge Preska's Stay Order and the agreement of the parties, the Court will STAY further proceedings as to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash [DE 1], pending Judge Preska's ruling on the Motions to Dismiss in the Primary Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Notice (Other) by Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc.. (Lee, Jermaine)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Notice of Order Staying Discovery in Primary Action and Request for Brief Enlargement of Time DE #5 and Requiring Plaintiff's Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (spe)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc. Order Staying Discovery in Primary Action (Simpson, Lonnie)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE, SETTING HEARING, AND REQUIRING FURTHER CONFERRAL AND FILING OF JOINT NOTICE: re: #1 Plaintiff Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc.'s Motion (Complaint) to Quash or Modify Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc's Non-Party Subpoena Requests Requiring Disclosure of Privileged and Protected Matters. (Joint Notice Deadline 4/9/2019.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District. (Response due by 3/21/2019, Reply due by 3/28/2019., Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (cds)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11447913, filed by Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice of Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Declaration of S. Shelley, #3 Exhibit Ex - Privilege Log, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Jermaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc. v. Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hapoalim Securities USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie Lloyd Simpson
Represented By: Stephen Bernard Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Burckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Chan
Represented By: Joanne M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabio D'Ascola
Represented By: Marko Cerenko
Represented By: Erin E Bohannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Maritime Museum, Inc.
Represented By: Jermaine Lee
Represented By: Eric Alexander Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?