Storick v. CFG LLC
Appellant: Scott Storick
Appellee: CFG LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv80126
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Reset Bankruptcy Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 4/15/2020. (ls)(per DE #8)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Appellant's Unopposed Motion for an extension of time to April 15, 2020, to file an Initial Brief. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/18/2020. (sk01)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Scott Storick. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Zinkler, George)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 3/26/2020. (jc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Scott Storick (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation ECF 84, #3 Appellant Designated Items 18-15728, #4 Appellant Designated Items 18-1455, #5 Appellant Designated Items 09-28716)(mon)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Scott Storick (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01455-ADV-MAM, filed by Scott Storick.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storick v. CFG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Storick
Represented By: Christian Robert Panagakos
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: George Leo Zinkler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CFG LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Schacknow
Represented By: Noel Robert Boeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?