Froehlich v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Froehlich
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Walmart Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80304
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:19-cv-11632 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80304-RLR on 2/26/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 23 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-11632. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/19/2020) (sjo)
February 24, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2020) (gr)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/30/2019) (gr)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi US Services Inc.. (dnh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (dnh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Inc.. (dnh)
December 23, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:19-cv-9527 and declined by Judge Analisa Torres and returned to wheel for assignment. (bcu)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi US Services Inc., re: #12 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re: #12 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart Inc., re: #12 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Walmart Inc.. Document filed by Richard Froehlich.(Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chattem, Inc.. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (pc)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Antonio Vozzolo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Orange;. (pc)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard Froehlich, WALMART INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Antonio Vozzolo to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the docket entry must match exactly how the party name appears on the summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
December 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 19cv9527. (pc)
December 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-09527-AT. Document filed by Richard Froehlich.(Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi US Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi Aventis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Froehlich. (Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-09527. Document filed by Richard Froehlich.(Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18322088)Document filed by Richard Froehlich.(Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Froehlich v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Froehlich
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?