Swearingen v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Swearingen
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, CVS Health Corp., The Kroger Co. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80313
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 25 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:20-cv-00527 with documents 1-22. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80313-RLR on 2/26/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 23 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00527. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/19/2020) (sjo)
February 24, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/23/2020) (jwh)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart, Inc.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi US Services Inc.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pfizer Inc. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CVS Health Corp.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chattem, Inc.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption contains a typographical error (Amanda Swearingen. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Antonio Vozzolo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Amanda Swearingen; The Kroger Co.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 19-cv-9527. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Antonio Vozzolo to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text and the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pfizer Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Kroger, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 1/22/2020 (jgo).
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walmart, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi US Services Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CVS Health Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-09527. Document filed by Amanda Swearingen.(Vozzolo, Antonio) Modified on 1/22/2020 (jgo).
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vozzolo, Antonio)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corp., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, The Kroger, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18552978)Document filed by Amanda Swearingen.(Vozzolo, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swearingen v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Swearingen
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?