Christian v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Christian and Kareen Christian
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) and U.S. Bank N.A.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80432
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. The Clerk shall also DENY any pending motion AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS). Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Crocker, Bradley)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Bank N.A.. U.S. Bank N.A. waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Crocker, Bradley)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley William Crocker on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS), U.S. Bank N.A.. Attorney Bradley William Crocker added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) (pty:dft), Attorney Bradley William Crocker added to party U.S. Bank N.A.(pty:dft). (Crocker, Bradley)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to pay the required filing fee is extended to April 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/31/2020. (jdr)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Kareen Christian. Responses due by 4/14/2020. (jas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Bruce Brown on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS), U.S. Bank N.A.. Attorney Benjamin Bruce Brown added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) (pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Bruce Brown added to party U.S. Bank N.A.(pty:dft). (Brown, Benjamin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) by Kareen Christian (mc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to US Bank N.A. by Kareen Christian (mc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. For this case to proceed, Plaintiff is required to pay the $400 filing fee by March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to U.S. Bank N.A. on 3/16/2020 by Kareen Christian. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS) on 3/16/2020 by Kareen Christian. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kareen Christian. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS), U.S. Bank N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Kareen Christian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS)
Represented By: Benjamin Bruce Brown
Represented By: Bradley William Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin Bruce Brown
Represented By: Bradley William Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareen Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?