C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc. v. Ingles Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation and C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Ingles Produce, Inc., a Florida corporation, Kareen Ingleton and Ingles Produce Inc,
Case Number: 9:2020cv80619
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: proposed Discovery Plan by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc..(De Falco, Steven)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (DE 11). The Parties request an extension of the deadline to file their proposed discovery plan and notice of mediator selection. The Parties state that this extension is necessary due to Plaintiff's attorney's scheduling conflicts and the memorial day holiday. I find good cause to grant the requested relief. Accordingly, the Parties shall file their proposed discovery plan and notice of mediator selection on or before June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/1/2020. (gts)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Discovery Plan and Notice of Mediator Selection re #9 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice, #2 Exhibit B - Revised Invoice, #3 Exhibit C - Payment)(De Falco, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2020., Discovery due by 10/26/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 7/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 11/9/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2020., Motions due by 11/9/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/21/2020., Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/13/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/13/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave L. Brannon for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc. by Kareen Ingleton, Ingles Produce Inc,. Attorney Robert Louis Shearin added to party Ingles Produce Inc,(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Louis Shearin added to party Kareen Ingleton(pty:dft). (Shearin, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.. Kareen Ingleton served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (De Falco, Steven)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.. Ingles Produce Inc, served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (De Falco, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc. (De Falco, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ingles Produce Inc,, Kareen Ingleton. (cds)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12722742, filed by C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Ingles Produce Inc, #3 Summon(s) Kareem Ingleton)(De Falco, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc. v. Ingles Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingles Produce, Inc., a Florida corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kareen Ingleton
Represented By: Robert Louis Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingles Produce Inc,
Represented By: Robert Louis Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W. Hendrix Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?