Tordjman v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ISSAC TORDJMAN, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, and Isaac Tordjman
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 9:2020cv80871
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. This case is STAYED. The Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motion AS MOOT. Any party may move to lift the stay upon a ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Any motion to lift the stay must be filed within 5 days of the ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Motions terminated: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Aaronson, Leah)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Aaronson, Leah)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Eastern District of Michigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 sent to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service)(mc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Isaac Tordjman re #1 Complaint filed by Isaac Tordjman (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Grossman, Stuart)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12957163, filed by Isaac Tordjman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossman, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tordjman v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISSAC TORDJMAN, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated,
Represented By: Stuart Z. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Tordjman
Represented By: Stuart Z. Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Wagner Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Aaronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?