Kahalani v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Golan Kahalani
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., State Farm Bank, FSB, CitiBank, N.A., Discover Financial Services, Digital Federal Credit Union and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81018
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff and Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union have filed a Notice of Settlement (DE #23 ), and the Court congratulates those Parties on their amicable resolution of this matter. The Parties are directed to file the appropriate closing documents on or by August 31, 2020, and their request for sixty days to file the closing documents is denied. Until closing documents are filed, this case will remain on the trial calendar and the court expects compliance with all pretrial deadlines. However, because this case is still in its early stages and in light of the Notice of Settlement, I will extend Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to August 31, 2020. Thus, on or before August 31, 2020, the applicable Parties must either file appropriate dismissal documents or alternatively, Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union must respond to the Complaint. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement if requested to do so before closing the case. Finally, I understand that it may be preferable to wait until both sides have fully performed under the terms of the settlement agreement before the case is closed, however I reiterate that it is unnecessary to delay the filing of appropriate dismissal paperwork because the Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement if asked to do so. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/21/2020. (jdr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Golan Kahalani. Replies due by 8/27/2020. (Zeig, Justin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Chipi, Nicole)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant JPMorgan's Motion to Dismiss was due by August 6, 2020. In the present Motion, Plaintiff seeks a thirty-day extension of this deadline due to Covid-19. (DE #22 ). I decline to enter this lengthy extension; instead, I will enter a limited extension. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (DE #15 ) is extended until August 20, 2020. However, going forward, motions for extensions of time or motions to modify the scheduling order should include specific facts to support the extension, including an explanation of what efforts have been made to comply with the deadline prior to the filing of the motion, and what specific obstacles the Parties' have encountered with respect to delays or problems caused by the pandemic. In other words, future motions should be tailored to the particular facts and circumstances of this litigation, and not premised upon generalized business disruption. I reiterate that it is my intent to accommodate the Parties to the extent necessary, while also avoiding undue delay to the progress of this litigation. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/7/2020. (jdr)
August 7, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement as to Digital Federal Credit Union by Golan Kahalani (Zeig, Justin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Golan Kahalani. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeig, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Golan Kahalani. State Farm Bank, FSB served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Zeig, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Discover Financial Services. (Solano, Sara)
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara L. Solano on behalf of Discover Financial Services. Attorney Sara L. Solano added to party Discover Financial Services(pty:dft). (Solano, Sara)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Golan Kahalani. Discover Financial Services waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Zeig, Justin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Golan Kahalani. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Zeig, Justin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Taormina, Alisa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Alisa M Taormina added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/6/2020 (Taormina, Alisa)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #12 Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion appears to be a duplicate of a previously granted motion. (SEE DE #11 ; DE 13). Accordingly, the Motion is moot. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2020. (jdr)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendant Digital Federal Credit Union's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Digital Federal's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until August 7, 2020, as requested. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2020. (jdr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint, by Digital Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Trybus, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Digital Federal Credit Union. Attorney Ronald Henry Trybus added to party Digital Federal Credit Union(pty:dft). (Trybus, Ronald)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #9 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Experian's deadline to respond to the Complaint is currently July 23, 2020. In the present Motion, Experian requests that this deadline be extended until August 21, 2020, "so that Experian may have sufficient time to investigate the allegations of the Complaint and prepare an appropriate and meaningful response to the Complaint." (DE #9 at 1-2). Under these circumstances, I find good cause to grant a limited extension. Defendant Experian's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2020. (jdr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chipi, Nicole)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Experian Information Solutions Inc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Chipi, Nicole)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Kristine Chipi on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Nicole Kristine Chipi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Chipi, Nicole)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2020., Discovery due by 12/14/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2020., In Limine Motions due by 12/28/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2020., Motions due by 12/28/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/1/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/24/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Golan Kahalani. CitiBank, N.A. waiver sent on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Zeig, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A., Digital Federal Credit Union, Discover Financial Services, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., State Farm Bank, FSB. (pcs)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CitiBank, N.A., Digital Federal Credit Union, Discover Financial Services, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., State Farm Bank, FSB. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13105203, filed by Golan Kahalani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) chase, #3 Summon(s) citi, #4 Summon(s) digital, #5 Summon(s) discover, #6 Summon(s) experian, #7 Summon(s) state farm)(Zeig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kahalani v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Kristine Chipi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Sara L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Ronald Henry Trybus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golan Kahalani
Represented By: Justin E. Zeig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?