CLARK v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Plaintiff: RENEE CLARK
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv81028
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-05350 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81028-RLR on 7/1/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-05350. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Panel Lifting Stay, transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RENEE CLARK. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (OBERGFELL, ANDREW)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
April 30, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10754507) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RENEE CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(OBERGFELL, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE CLARK
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?