DeSimone v. Menotte
Appellee: Deborah Menotte
Appellant: Michael DeSimone
Case Number: 9:2020cv81034
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
2 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 08/27/2020. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to #14 Response to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Deborah Menotte. (Carnahan, Rilyn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. The Response [DE 14] is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/25/2020. (lbn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Michael DeSimone. Replies due by 8/31/2020. (Merrill, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellant Brief until September 23, 2020 re 6 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by Michael DeSimone. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Merrill, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Deborah Menotte (Carnahan, Rilyn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Deborah Menotte re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law Notice of Filing Exhibit "1" to Motion to Dismiss (Carnahan, Rilyn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Deborah Menotte. (Carnahan, Rilyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Michael DeSimone. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (Merrill, David) Modified Relief on 8/21/2020 (ls).
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Deborah Menotte. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Bakst, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/24/2020. (jc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael DeSimone (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant Designation and Designated Items, #3 Appellee Designation and Designated Items)(mon)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael DeSimone (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13718-BKC-MAM, filed by Michael DeSimone. (Attachments: #1 Order DE 164)(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSimone v. Menotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deborah Menotte
Represented By: Michael Richard Bakst
Represented By: Rilyn Anne Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael DeSimone
Represented By: Leslie Scott Osborne
Represented By: Jay Andrew Meyers
Represented By: David Lloyd Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?