Jerde v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jerde
Defendant: Inc Pfizer, Kaiser Permanente International, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81096
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 32 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 3:20-cv-03958 with documents 1-29. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81096-RLR on 7/9/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03958. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on 7/7/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE ENTRY***ORDER STAYING CASES PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/30/2020. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) Modified on 6/30/2020 (tvnS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STAYING CASES PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION REGARDING TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 26 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blaschke, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Blaschke (Blaschke, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 24 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SHORTENED TIME; SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/23/2020. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #20 Notice (Other), (Notice of Order Granting Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Jerde. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/7/2020. Replies due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Order Granting Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #16 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/23/2020) Modified on 6/24/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARINGS. You are hereby notified that the hearings re #12 Amended MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Impose Sanctions are VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #16 Notice (Other), ( #16 Notice of Related Cases) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #12 Amended MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12; Administrative Motion to Whether Cases Should Be Related and Defendants' Response by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/19/2020) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Jerde re #13 MOTION to Remand (Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline PLC for GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Impose Sanctions filed by Michael Jerde. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/1/2020. Replies due by 7/8/2020. (Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/1/2020. Replies due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/17/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Jerde.. (Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by both) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20061603. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14578979). Filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerde v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Blaschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Blaschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jerde
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?