Unger v. Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Unger
Defendant: Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81175
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Edell, Justin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Response/Answer due 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/25/2020. (eca)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II recused. Case reassigned to Judge Raag Singhal and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.. Attorney Justin David Edell added to party Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edell, Justin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Kate Beige on behalf of Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.. Attorney Rachel Kate Beige added to party Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.(pty:dft). (Beige, Rachel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.. (pcs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Unger. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13201563, filed by Steven Unger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for accommodation, #2 Exhibit Denial of Request for Accommodation, #3 Exhibit Second Request for Accommodation, #4 Exhibit Second Denial, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s))(LaHart, Marcy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unger v. Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majorca At Via Verde Homeowners Association Inc.
Represented By: Justin David Edell
Represented By: Rachel Kate Beige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Unger
Represented By: Marcy I. LaHart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?