United States Of America v. Mirante et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Stephanie M. Mirante and Peter A Mirante
Case Number: 9:2020cv81328
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Defendants Stephanie M Mirante and Peter A Mirante ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Peter A Mirante, Stephanie M. Mirante. (Beers, Mitchell)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020., Discovery due by 2/8/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/22/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2021., Motions due by 2/22/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/29/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/21/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Defendants Stephanie M. Mirante and Peter A. Mirante's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Stephanie M. Mirante and Peter A. Mirante to respond to the Amended Complaint (DE #4 ) is September 17, 2020. (DE #7 ; DE #8 ). Defendants seek to extend that deadline by 13 days, citing that Defendants' counsel was "recently retained" and "[d]ue to the press of other litigation, and other conflicts, together with the need to obtain and review the file and consult with the Defendants,... will not have sufficient time to adequately prepare a response to the Complaint by the current due date." (DE #9 ). Based upon the brief nature of the requested extension and the fact that this Motion is unopposed, I find good cause to grant the extension. Therefore, the deadline for Defendants Stephanie M. Mirante and Peter A. Mirante to respond to the Amended Complaint (DE #4 ) is extended to September 30, 2020. No other litigation deadlines are modified or amended as a result of this Order, and I will not grant further extensions absent exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/17/2020. (kal)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Amended Complaint by Peter A Mirante, Stephanie M. Mirante. Attorney Mitchell J Beers added to party Peter A Mirante(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell J Beers added to party Stephanie M. Mirante(pty:dft). (Beers, Mitchell)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Peter A Mirante served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Bluestein, Lauren)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Stephanie M. Mirante served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Bluestein, Lauren)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Bluestein, Lauren)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Bluestein, Lauren)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bluestein, Lauren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Peter A Mirante, Stephanie M. Mirante, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Stephanie M. Mirante, #3 Summon(s) Peter A. Mirante, #4 Summon(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #5 Civil COmplaint Cover Sheet)(Bluestein, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Mirante et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie M. Mirante
Represented By: Mitchell J Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A Mirante
Represented By: Mitchell J Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?