Kensington Walk Master Association, Inc v. Everest National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kensington Walk Master Association, Inc
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81338
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Everest National Insurance Company, John S. Freud as Mediator. (Vander Klok, Jedidiah)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Everest National Insurance Company (Vander Klok, Jedidiah)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND AMEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER denying #10 Joint Motion to Modify Trial Date and Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Modify Trial Date and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Everest National Insurance Company. (Levy, Joshua)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020., Discovery due by 2/8/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/22/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2021., Motions due by 2/22/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/29/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jedidiah David Vander Klok on behalf of Everest National Insurance Company. Attorney Jedidiah David Vander Klok added to party Everest National Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Vander Klok, Jedidiah)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/21/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Remand filed by Everest National Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (Levy, Joshua)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand by Kensington Walk Master Association, Inc. (Corvaia-O'Donnell, Maria)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Everest National Insurance Company. (Levy, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everest National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent e.Everest Re Group, Ltd, Other Affiliate Josh Levy, Esq, Other Affiliate a.Everest National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate b.Everest Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate c.Everest Reinsurance Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate d.Everest Underwriting Group Limited, Other Affiliate f.Kennedys CMK LLP, Other Affiliate h.Kensington Walk Master Association for Everest National Insurance Company (Levy, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13369948, filed by Everest National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levy, Joshua) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 8/18/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kensington Walk Master Association, Inc v. Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Asher Levy
Represented By: Jedidiah David Vander Klok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kensington Walk Master Association, Inc
Represented By: Maria D. Corvaia-O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?