Martinez et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Isabel Lugo Martinez, Laura Elaine Lugo Martinez and Minelle Tendler
Defendant: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company and Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81343
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Eric Luckman as Mediator. (Pett, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pett, Kristina)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION (Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2020., Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Fact Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Expert Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/8/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/8/2021., Motions due by 2/8/2021., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021., Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Referring Case And Setting Trial Date: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Isabel Lugo Martinez, Minelle Tendler, Laura Elaine Lugo Martinez. Transamerica Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Rosen, Joseph)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Transamerica Life Insurance Company, filed by Isabel Lugo Martinez, Minelle Tendler, Laura Elaine Lugo Martinez.(Rosen, Joseph)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant seeks a two-week extension of time in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. I find good cause to grant the requested relief. Accordingly, Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before September 9, 2020. No further extensions of this deadline shall be granted absent a compelling showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/24/2020. (gts)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Pett, Kristina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company (Pett, Kristina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit E to Notice of Removal by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Cover Sheet (Corrected)) (Pett, Kristina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13374739, filed by Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Receipt, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pett, Kristina) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 8/19/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Beth Pett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Beth Pett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Lugo Martinez
Represented By: Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Elaine Lugo Martinez
Represented By: Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minelle Tendler
Represented By: Joseph Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?