Mairena et al v. Tradestaff Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Perez Godinez, Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Tomas Mairena and Joel Jacinto
Defendant: Tradestaff Management, Inc. and Mitchell J. Daigle
Case Number: 9:2020cv81346
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 the Parties' Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice, Approving Settlement, and Dismissing Action With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to conduct all further proceedings, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Gabriel Perez Godinez, Joel Jacinto, Tomas Mairena (Scott, Cathleen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held by Zoom Video with all parties. Fairness Hearing by Zoom Video Teleconference held on 10/6/2020. The Court reviewed the Joint Motion to Approve the Settlement [DE 6]. The Court found the settlement fair and reasonable. The Court approved the settlement. Parties will file a consent to magistrate jurisdiction form. Written order to be issued. Total time in court: 7 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Pamela Jorgensen for Plaintiffs, Joshua Loren for Defendants. (Digital 14:00:26) (kza)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: A Fairness Hearing shall be conducted via Zoom video teleconference (VTC) on Tuesday, October 6, 2020, at 2:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.The undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, Ken Zuniga, will email counsel instructions for accessing the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/28/2020. (no00)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING #6 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Joel Jacinto, Tomas Mairena, Gabriel Perez Godinez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval and Dismissal With Prejudice by Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Gabriel Perez Godinez, Joel Jacinto, Tomas Mairena. Responses due by 10/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Cathleen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice on #4 Notice of Settlement; Parties Dismissal Papers due 9/30/2020; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Gabriel Perez Godinez, Joel Jacinto, Tomas Mairena (Scott, Cathleen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mitchell J. Daigle and Tradestaff Management, Inc. (scn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mitchell J. Daigle, Tradestaff Management, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13375897, filed by Tomas Mairena, Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa, Gabriel Perez Godinez, Joel Jacinto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Tradestaff Management Inc., #3 Summon(s) Mitchell J. Daigle)(Scott, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mairena et al v. Tradestaff Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradestaff Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell J. Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Perez Godinez
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quein Ariel Jacinto Figueroa
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Mairena
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Jacinto
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?