Ramin Rassouli v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ramin Rassouli
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Does 1 through 300, inclusive, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81465
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 37 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of California Central. Case Number 8:20-cv-01462 with documents 1-34. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81465-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (pes)
September 1, 2020 Filing 36 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 8:20-cv-01462. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
August 31, 2020 Filing 34 Conditional Transfer Order - 31 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/26/2020. (lb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 32 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Perrigo Company, PLC. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 30 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Perrigo Research & Development Company. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc.. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc.. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (es)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (es)
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli, identifying BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; SANOFI US SERVICES INC.; CHATTEM, INC.; PFIZER, INC.; GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC; PERRIGO COMPANY PLC; PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY; AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Treyzon, Boris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27537804 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ramin Rassouli. (Attorney Boris Treyzon added to party Ramin Rassouli(pty:pla))(Treyzon, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramin Rassouli v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Research & Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramin Rassouli
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?