Siakavaras v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Georgios Siakavaras
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, SANOFI S.A and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81684
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of New York. Case Number 1:20-cv-04130 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81684-RLR on 9/15/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04130. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
September 14, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-34: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (Marziliano, August)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-34: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Marziliano, August)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER STAYING CASE: The defendants letter application #7 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The case is stayed until the MDL panel determines if this case should be a tag-along case to MDL 2924 pending in the Southern District of Florida. By October 30, 2020 counsel shall file a status report letter as to their MDL application, if is not transferred by the above date. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/4/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Letter re: Pre-Motion Conference for Agreed Motion to Stay Action by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC from Richmond County Supreme Court, case number 151337/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13310090) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 State Court Docket and Pleadings) (Boccanfuso, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siakavaras v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Anthony D. Boccanfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Anthony D. Boccanfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Anthony D. Boccanfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgios Siakavaras
Represented By: Craig M. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?