Kuhlmann v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Kuhlmann
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Essentia Health - Dakota Pharmacy Health Center, Sanofi US Services, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Apotex Corporation, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Strides Pharma Science Ltd., Pfizer, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuitcal Industries, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Essentia Health - Dakota Clinic Pharmacy and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81765
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Craig Kuhlmann. Essentia Health - Dakota Clinic Pharmacy served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (McGoldrick, Marilyn)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Craig Kuhlmann. Essentia Health - Dakota Pharmacy Health Center served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (McGoldrick, Marilyn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:20-cv-81765-RLR with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
October 9, 2020 Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (yha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13603875, filed by Craig Kuhlmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Amneal, #3 Summon(s) Apotex, #4 Summon(s) Boehringer, #5 Summon(s) Essentia - Clinic, #6 Summon(s) Essentia - Center, #7 Summon(s) Glaxo, #8 Summon(s) Glenmark, #9 Summon(s) Mylan, #10 Summon(s) Par, #11 Summon(s) Pfizer, #12 Summon(s) Sandoz, #13 Summon(s) Sanofi, #14 Summon(s) Strides, #15 Summon(s) Sun, #16 Summon(s) Wockhardt)(McGoldrick, Marilyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhlmann v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITH KLINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Health - Dakota Pharmacy Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strides Pharma Science Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuitcal Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Health - Dakota Clinic Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Kuhlmann
Represented By: Marilyn T. McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?