Recycled Paper International, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Recycled Paper International, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81888
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File ITs Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Keller, Courtney)
December 3, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance)
December 1, 2020 Filing 41 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney)
December 1, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Striking #36 Notice (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney)
December 1, 2020 Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re #36 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Mario D. German Law Center, P.A., shall answer the Complaint on or before December 10, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/30/20.(rwr)
November 30, 2020 Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading to complaint by Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (German, Mario)
November 30, 2020 Filing 36 STRICKEN per DE #40 . NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 12/1/2020 (pcs).
November 23, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. (Shinder, Lance)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Mario D. German Law Center, P.A., shall answer the Complaint on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/16/20.(rwr)
November 16, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.. Attorney Mario Danilo German added to party Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.(pty:dft). (German, Mario)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply and granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its Motion to Remand #20 on or before November 23, 2020. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss #28 on or before December 3, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/10/20.(rwr)
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Responses due by 11/24/2020 (Shinder, Lance)
November 10, 2020 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file reply re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Responses due by 11/24/2020 (Shinder, Lance)
November 9, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Keller, Courtney)
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/19/2020 (Keller, Courtney)
November 5, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Keller, Courtney)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: granting #25 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keller, Courtney)
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 11/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance)
October 29, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Mario D. German Law Center, P.A. served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Shinder, Lance)
October 22, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Mario D. German Law Center, P.A. (pcs)
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: Hearing held by Zoom Video Teleconference with all parties. Scheduling Conference by Zoom Video held on 10/22/2020. Discussion held on possibility of settlement, discovery and consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Scheduling Order to be issued. Total time in court: 17 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s):Kyle A. Johnson for Plaintiff and Lindsay Laura Macdonald for Defendant. (Digital 11:02:42) (kza)
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Recycled Paper International, LLC. (Shinder, Lance)
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Recycled Paper International, LLC re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC (Shinder, Lance)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Mario D. German Law Center, P.A. by Recycled Paper International, LLC (Shinder, Lance)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC.(Shinder, Lance)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/3/2020 (Keller, Courtney)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Statement of: Pre-Conference Conferral by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #10 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, (Keller, Courtney)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Continue Modify Trial Date re #9 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keller, Courtney)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant shall answer the Complaint on or before October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 10/15/20.(rwr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Keller, Courtney)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE (VTC): (Scheduling Conference via Zoom Video set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Wayne Shinder on behalf of Recycled Paper International, LLC (Shinder, Lance)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shinder, Lance)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/15/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 10/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Civil Cover Sheet (Keller, Courtney)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kyle A. Johnson, mailing date October 9, 2020, (pt)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13667662, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keller, Courtney) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 10/9/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recycled Paper International, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recycled Paper International, LLC
Represented By: Lance Wayne Shinder
Represented By: Kyle A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay Laura Macdonald
Represented By: Courtney M Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.
Represented By: Mario Danilo German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?