D'Alessandro v. Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Louis D'Alessandro, III
Defendant: Deputy Everardo Ortiz, Deputy Matthew Perez, Deputy J. Beaupre, Corporal James Clodfelter, Deputy Daniel Willis, Deputy Andrew Zernitsky, Segeant Bryant, Deputy Eliecer Ramos, Deputy Genaro Cabrera, Deputy J. Johnson, Deputy Elijah Ross and Nurse Ruth Ihinger
Case Number: 9:2020cv81943
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 34 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruth Ihinger. Attorney Jeffery Rodman Lawley added to party Ruth Ihinger(pty:dft). (Lawley, Jeffery)
December 2, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by J. Beaupre, Bryant, Genaro Cabrera, James Clodfelter, J. Johnson, Everardo Ortiz, Matthew Perez, Eliecer Ramos, Elijah Ross, Daniel Willis, Andrew Zernitsky. (Jisa, Adriana)
December 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of J. Beaupre, Bryant, Genaro Cabrera, James Clodfelter, J. Johnson, Everardo Ortiz, Matthew Perez, Eliecer Ramos, Elijah Ross, Daniel Willis, Andrew Zernitsky. Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party J. Beaupre(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Bryant(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Genaro Cabrera(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party James Clodfelter(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party J. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Everardo Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Matthew Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Eliecer Ramos(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Elijah Ross(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Daniel Willis(pty:dft), Attorney Adriana Mihaela Jisa added to party Andrew Zernitsky(pty:dft). (Jisa, Adriana)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to District Judge Aileen M Cannon for all further proceedings, Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Eliecer Ramos served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Genaro Cabrera served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Daniel Willis served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Ruth Ihinger served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Everardo Ortiz served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Matthew Perez served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Bryant served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Elijah Ross served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Andrew Zernitsky served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Deputy J. Beaupre served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 J. Johnson served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 James Clodfelter served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (ebz)
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Registered Nurse Ruth Ihinger. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Deputy Elijah Ross. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Deputy J. Beaupre. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Deputy Daniel Willis. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Deputy Matthew Perez. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Deputy Andrew Zernitsky. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Deputy Genaro Cabrera. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Deputy Everardo Ortiz. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Deputy J. Johnson. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Corporal James Clodfelter. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sergeant Bryant. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lieutenant Eliecer Ramos. (daa)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO U.S. MARSHAL DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS Lieutenant Eliecer Ramos, Sergeant Bryant, Corporal James Clodfelter, Deputy J. Johnson, Deputy Everardo Ortiz, Deputy Genaro Cabrera, Deputy Andrew Zernitsky, Deputy Matthew Perez, Deputy Daniel Willis,Deputy J. Beaupre, Deputy Elijah Ross, and Registered Nurse Ruth Ihinger. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER. The case shall proceed on: A Fifth Amendment excessive force claim (supervisory liability) against Lt. Ramos and Sgt. Bryant in their individual capacities. A Fifth Amendment excessive force claim against Cpl. Clodfelter, Dep. Johnson, Dep. Ortiz, Dep. Cabrera, and Dep. Zernitsky in their individual capacities. A Fifth Amendment failure-to-intervene claim against Lt. Ramos, Sgt. Bryant, Dep. Perez, Dep. Willis, Dep. Beaupre, and Dep. Ross in their individual capacities. A Fifth Amendment medical deliberate indifference claim against Nurse Ihinger in her individual capacity. The Court will direct the U.S. Marshal to serve process forthwith. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available. The jail/prison having custody of the Plaintiff must make payments from the prisone's account to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the full filing fee of $350 is paid. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (daa)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Louis D'Alessandro. (daa)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (daa)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against J. Beaupre, Bryant, Genaro Cabrera, James Clodfelter, Ruth Ihinger, J. Johnson, Everardo Ortiz, Matthew Perez, Eliecer Ramos, Elijah Ross, Daniel Willis, Andrew Zernitsky. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Joseph Louis D'Alessandro.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Alessandro v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Everardo Ortiz
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Matthew Perez
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Beaupre
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal James Clodfelter
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Daniel Willis
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Andrew Zernitsky
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segeant Bryant
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Eliecer Ramos
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Genaro Cabrera
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Johnson
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Elijah Ross
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Ruth Ihinger
Represented By: Jeffery Rodman Lawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Louis D'Alessandro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?