Garzon v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gladys Garzon
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORP., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC. and PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 9:2020cv82183
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:20-cv-82183-RLR with documents 1-10. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
December 4, 2020 Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORP.. (kpe)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp. by Gladys Garzon re #1 Complaint,, filed by Gladys Garzon (Maldonado, Nicole)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Gladys Garzon re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet (Maldonado, Nicole)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Summons for BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORP. not provided. (ebz)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(ebz)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 20cv62423. (ebz)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORP., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, PFIZER, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13932283, filed by Gladys Garzon. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Summon(s) to Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp., #3 Summon(s) to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, #4 Summon(s) to Pfizer, Inc., #5 Summon(s) to Sanofi US Services Inc., #6 Summon(s) to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC)(Maldonado, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garzon v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Garzon
Represented By: Nicole K.H. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?