Franklin et al v. Burki
Plaintiff: Sarah Babaa, Elisabeth Franklin and Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Lissa Franklin
Defendant: Mr Andrew Urs Burki, Jane Doe, John Doe, Andrew Burki, Andrew Campbell Burki and Andrew Campbel
Case Number: 9:2021cv80013
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Renewed Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Plaintiffs shall file their Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by no later than March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on February 26, 2021. (ahz)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Sarah Babaa, Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC. Responses due by 3/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Craig)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #12 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs seek a seven-day enlargement of the deadline to file a Response in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs, however, do not set forth a basis for their request. Accordingly, the Plaintiffs must file their Response in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by March 1, 2021, or file a renewed motion justifying their request for an extension. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on February 25, 2021. (ahz)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Sarah Babaa, Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Craig)
February 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Andrew Urs Burki. Responses due by 3/1/2021 (Cornwell, William)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Amended Complaint #5 . Defendant shall have until February 16, 2021, to respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/2/2021. (AMC)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Andrew Urs Burki. Attorney William John Cornwell added to party Andrew Urs Burki(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, William)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#7]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (scn)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC, Sarah Babaa. Andrew Urs Burki served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021. (scn)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Babaa, Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC of Complaint on Defendant (Robinson, Craig)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC, Sarah Babaa.(Robinson, Craig)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint clarifying the citizenship of Plaintiff Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLCs members no later than January 20, 2021. (Amended Complaint due by 1/20/2021) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Urs Burki. (ebz)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14152910, filed by Elisabeth Franklin, Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC, Sarah Babaa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Robinson, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin et al v. Burki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Andrew Urs Burki
Represented By: William John Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Burki
Represented By: William John Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Campbell Burki
Represented By: William John Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Campbel
Represented By: William John Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Babaa
Represented By: Craig Matthew Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Franklin
Represented By: Craig Matthew Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lissa Franklin & Associates, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Lissa Franklin
Represented By: Craig Matthew Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?