Sigouin v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brian Matthew Sigouin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 9:2021cv80368
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO FILE ANSWER re #14 Second MOTION Motion for 2255 Amended filed by Brian Matthew Sigouin (Responses due by 6/7/2021, Replies due by 7/7/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION Motion for 2255 Amended by Brian Matthew Sigouin. (Alfonso, Armando)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation for any dispositive issues. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Movant's Amended 2255 Motion is due by April 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/16/2021. (sk01)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time None by Brian Matthew Sigouin. Responses due by 3/29/2021 (Alfonso, Armando)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Armando Roberto Alfonso, III on behalf of Brian Matthew Sigouin. Attorney Armando Roberto Alfonso, III added to party Brian Matthew Sigouin(pty:pla). (Alfonso, Armando)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's NOTICE of Compliance re 8 Order on Motion to Produce, copy of criminal and civil docket sheets, plea agreement and DE #1 sent. (pcs)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Court Documents. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to send Movant a copy of this docket sheet and a copy of docket entry 1 (Movant's original Motion to Vacate Sentence). The Clerk of Court is also ORDERED to send Movant a copy of the docket sheet for Movant's criminal case (19-cr-80136) and a copy of docket entry 58 (Plea Agreement) in the criminal case. Movant's request for transcripts is denied, as Movant has been ordered to file an Amended Motion to Vacate Sentence #4 and as a prisoner is not entitled to transcripts at the government's expense for the purpose of preparing a collateral motion. See United States v. Adamson, 681 F. App'x 824, 826-27 (11th Cir. 2017). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/8/2021. (sk01)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Produce Transcripts by Brian Matthew Sigouin. (Criminal and Civil Docket Sheet, DE #1 and Plea Agreement Sent). (pcs)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-open this case. This matter was incorrectly closed and consolidated at docket entry 5 due to a scrivener's error. The Court's order at docket entry 4 requiring amendment remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (ENTERED IN ERROR per DE 6) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) Modified document restricted due to error on 2/24/2021 (mc).
February 24, 2021 Case Reopened per DE 6 Order. (mc)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDMENT OF MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255, (Amended Complaint due by 3/16/2021.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Schiller on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Gregory Schiller added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Schiller, Gregory)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (ail)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 19cr80136), filed by Brian Matthew Sigouin.(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sigouin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Gregory Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Matthew Sigouin
Represented By: Armando Roberto Alfonso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?