Roig Cardenales et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ana Elena Roig Cardenales, Victor D Perez Vazquez, Maria Castro Rodriguez, Gloria Torres Melendez, Angel Tellado, Efrain Figueroa Baez, Yadira Delgado, Lynda Colon Lopez, Yolanda Claudio, Maria De Los Angeles Vega Oliveras, Nilda J Acosta Montalvo, Iria Alvarado Collazo, Carmen Morgado Ortiz, Lourdes Rivera Gonzalez, Wilfredo Casiano, German Delgado Lugo, Ana Martinez Vazquez, Brenda Liz Martinez, Miriam I Velez Ocasio, Jose Luis Matos Gonzalez, Ana B Castro Rodriguez and Carmen Plaza
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, John Doe 1-100, Super Farmacia Nelia, Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer Inc, Farmacia Baldorioty, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc.,, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Farmacia El Tuque, Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico Inc., Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Farmacia Marilyn, Farmacias Caribe, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation, Cardinal Health P.R. 218, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Puerto Rico Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Cardinal Health P.R. 220, LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Cardinal Health P.R. 120, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health P.R. 436, Inc., Corporacion Flores Rivera, Drogueria Betances, LLC, Amerisource Corporation, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. and Farmacia Cristina LMDM LLC
Case Number: 9:2021cv80594
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01103 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80594-RLR on 3/24/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01103. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-57 received from the Southern District of Florida. (Attachments: #1 E-mail notification from Southern District of Florida) (gav)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-57) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Tag along actions, #2 Notice of Electronic Filing) (gav)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Drogueria Betances LLC Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortega-Nunez, Miguel) Modified on 3/16/2021 remove italics (gav).
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 3/12/2021 remove italics (gav).
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 11, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Jimenez-Rodriguez, Pedro)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katarina Stipec-Rubio on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Stipec-Rubio, Katarina)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents; granting #2 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 5, 2021 to file Certified Translation of Exhibit C to Notice of Removal. Certified Translation due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/9/2021. (ERC)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Velez-Colon, Jose)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until April 5, 2021 to file Certified Translation of Exhibit C to Notice of Removal filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Responses due by 3/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2020CV04933. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7210794), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Translation of First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings and Orders, #4 Exhibit D - Sanofi Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Amerisource Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - McKesson Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - GSK Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - Cardinal Declaration, #9 Exhibit I - Pfizer Declaration, #10 Category Sheet, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roig Cardenales et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Farmacia Nelia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmacia Baldorioty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.,
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmacia El Tuque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Katarina Stipec-Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmacia Marilyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmacias Caribe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation
Represented By: Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Katarina Stipec-Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health P.R. 218, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline Puerto Rico Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Katarina Stipec-Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health P.R. 220, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health P.R. 120, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health P.R. 436, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporacion Flores Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drogueria Betances, LLC
Represented By: Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmacia Cristina LMDM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Elena Roig Cardenales
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor D Perez Vazquez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Castro Rodriguez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Torres Melendez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Tellado
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Figueroa Baez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Delgado
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Colon Lopez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Claudio
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Los Angeles Vega Oliveras
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilda J Acosta Montalvo
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iria Alvarado Collazo
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Morgado Ortiz
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Rivera Gonzalez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Casiano
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Delgado Lugo
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Martinez Vazquez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Liz Martinez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam I Velez Ocasio
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Matos Gonzalez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana B Castro Rodriguez
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Plaza
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?