Cook et al v. Coinsquare Ltd.
Plaintiff: Victor J. Cook and AltPay Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Coinsquare Ltd.
Case Number: 9:2021cv80692
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CLOSING CASE. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by AltPay Holdings, LLC, Victor J. Cook (Gaukroger, Gavin)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. (yar)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2021., ALL Discovery due by 11/1/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2021., In Limine Motions due by 11/15/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2021., Pretrial Motions due by 11/15/2021., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/20/2021., Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/12/2022 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE (Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/12/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jason M. Rosenthal. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/14/2021. (apo)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason M. Rosenthal. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14604864 by AltPay Holdings, LLC, Victor J. Cook. Responses due by 4/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaukroger, Gavin)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTED - Bar Letter (corrected Firm listing) re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven P. Blonder, mailing date Jason M. Rosenthal, (pt)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Steven P. Blonder and Jason M. Rosenthal, mailing date April 12, 2021, (pt)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coinsquare Ltd.. (ebz)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coinsquare Ltd.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14595323, filed by Victor J. Cook, AltPay Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Settlement Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Gaukroger, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Coinsquare Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor J. Cook
Represented By: Gavin Cunningham Gaukroger
Represented By: Charles Howard Lichtman
Represented By: Jason M. Rosenthal
Represented By: Steven P. Blonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AltPay Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gavin Cunningham Gaukroger
Represented By: Charles Howard Lichtman
Represented By: Jason M. Rosenthal
Represented By: Steven P. Blonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinsquare Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?