STRANGE et al v. AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY STEWART, JULIO RUIZ, RICHARD SHIELDS and KRISTOPHER STRANGE
Defendant: RALPH GIORDANO and AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC.
Case Number: 9:2021cv80766
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by RALPH GIORDANO, AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC. I hereby RECOMMEND that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 4) be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 18, 2021 Filing 18 Joint RESPONSE to #9 Statement of Claim by AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC., RALPH GIORDANO. (Levine, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by RALPH GIORDANO, AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC.. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/20/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 6/14/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2021., Discovery due by 2/22/2022., Expert Discovery due by 2/22/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 7/27/2021., Mediation Deadline 3/1/2022., In Limine Motions due by 4/5/2022., Motions due by 3/8/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/5/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by KRISTOPHER STRANGE (Norell, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time for Parties to Submit Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall submit their joint scheduling report by Monday, June 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/11/2021. (co)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JULIO RUIZ, RICHARD SHIELDS, ANTHONY STEWART, KRISTOPHER STRANGE (Norell, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC., RALPH GIORDANO (Levine, Daniel)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report re #7 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by JULIO RUIZ, RICHARD SHIELDS, ANTHONY STEWART, KRISTOPHER STRANGE. Responses due by 6/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norell, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 Statement of: Claim by JULIO RUIZ, RICHARD SHIELDS, ANTHONY STEWART, KRISTOPHER STRANGE re #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Norell, Robert)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC., RALPH GIORDANO. (Levine, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTAND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Miscellaneous Deadline 6/10/2021., Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/10/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by JULIO RUIZ, RICHARD SHIELDS, ANTHONY STEWART, KRISTOPHER STRANGE. Replies due by 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Norell, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC., RALPH GIORDANO. Attorney Daniel R. Levine added to party AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R. Levine added to party RALPH GIORDANO(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC. and RALPH GIORDANO. (scn)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14639220, filed by KRISTOPHER STRANGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Norell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRANGE et al v. AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY STEWART
Represented By: Robert Scott Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO RUIZ
Represented By: Robert Scott Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SHIELDS
Represented By: Robert Scott Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER STRANGE
Represented By: Robert Scott Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH GIORDANO
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCRAFT DEMOLITION, INC.
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?