UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Lozman
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Fane Lozman
Case Number: 9:2021cv81119
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Reinaldo Diaz filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/24/2021. (Adkins, Brandon)
August 17, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Leon Granowitz filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/24/2021. (Adkins, Brandon)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Granting 23 Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2021 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 11, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to #11 Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by Fane Lozman. (cds)
August 9, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Reinaldo Diaz by Fane Lozman. Responses due by 8/23/2021 (cds)
August 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Leon Granowitz by Fane Lozman. Responses due by 8/23/2021 (cds)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Jonathan Pempek)(Adkins, Brandon)
August 3, 2021 Filing 24 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #22 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Response. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (cds)
August 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION/Request for Hearing re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (For Image See DE#22 ) by Fane Lozman. (cds)
August 3, 2021 Filing 22 (RESTRICTED) Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Response re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fane Lozman. Replies due by 8/10/2021. (cds) Modified text on 8/3/2021 (asl). Modified Security on 8/3/2021 (cds).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Defendant's Motion to Strike Declaration of Reinaldo Diaz and #19 Defendant's Motion to Strike Declaration of Leon Granowitz. Defendant filed his Motions in violation of Southern District of Florida Local Rule 7.1(a)(3), which requires counsel for the moving party to certify in the motion that it has "confer[red] (orally or in writing), or ma[de] reasonable effort to confer (orally or in writing), with all parties or non-parties who may be affected by the relief sought in the motion." Defendant may renew his Motions but only after conferring in accordance with the Local Rules and only if the renewed Motion includes a compliant certificate of conferral. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/30/2021. (hck)
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/6/2021. (Menees, Sydney)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Leon Granowitz by Fane Lozman. Responses due by 8/10/2021 (cds)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #15 Defendant's Motion for Clarification on Court Order (DE #12 ). In light of my Paperless Order Regarding Deadline to Respond to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE 14), which addresses the requested relief raised in Defendant's present Motion, Docket Entry #15 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/26/2021. (hck)
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Fane Lozman to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: fane@fanelozman.com (cds)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Reinaldo Diaz by Fane Lozman. Responses due by 8/6/2021 (cds)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for clarification re #12 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Fane Lozman. Responses due by 8/6/2021 (cds)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO #4 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. In my prior Order (DE #12 ), I extended Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DE #4 ) by one week but miscalculated the extended due date. (DE #12 at 2). Given that Defendant, who is appearing in this action pro se, was served with the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, together with the Summons and Complaint, on July 2, 2021, the deadline for Defendant to respond to that Motion is July 23, 2021. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A)(i); S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(c)(1) ("For a motion served with the summons and complaint, the opposing memorandum of law shall be due on the day the response to the complaint is due."). Accordingly, I hereby correct my previous Order (DE #12 ) and extend the deadline for Defendant to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by one week to July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/22/2021. (hck)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Motion Terminated #9 Motion to Direct Court Administrator/Clerk of Court to Assign Login and Password for Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting in Part and Deferred in Part #7 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Deferred in Part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion ( Responses due by 7/23/2021). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Adkins Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adkins, Brandon)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Fane Lozman (cds)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Direct Court Administrator/Clerk of Court to Assign Login and Password for Electronic Filing by Fane Lozman. (cds)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Improper Service of Summons by Fane Lozman (cds)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 7/30/2021), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint by Fane Lozman. (cds)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Adkins, Brandon)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Fane Lozman served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Adkins, Brandon)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pempek Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Diaz Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Granowitz Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Interlandi Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Adkins Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adkins, Brandon)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fane Lozman. (cds)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fane Lozman. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Adkins, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Lozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fane Lozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Sydney A. Menees
Represented By: Brandon N. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?