Richardson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Richardson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 9:2021cv81138
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 Transverse Response to the Government's Opposition re #7 Answer to Complaint by Timothy L. Richardson. (pcs)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File to the extent that the time for filing Movant's Reply is extended until on or before SEPTEMBER 10, 2021. Movant is cautioned, however, that no further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION Requesting 30 Day Extension to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Answer to Complaint by Timothy L. Richardson. (pcs)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correction Sentence Pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 by United States of America. (McMillan, John)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing hearing held on 7/16/2020 before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks, 1-13 pages, Court Reporter: Jill Wells, 305-523-5158 / Jill_Wells@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2021. (Wells, Jill)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C. McMillan on behalf of United States of America. Attorney John C. McMillan added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (McMillan, John)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2255. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE HABEAS PETITIONERS. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. (daa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 9:20-cr-80044-DMM), filed by Timothy L. Richardson.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: John C. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?