Johnson v. McKay
Plaintiff: Lee Mitchell Johnson
Defendant: Deputy McKay
Case Number: 9:2021cv81198
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Referral to the Volunteer Attorney Program. Plaintiff may refile his request at such time as an Answer is filed in this action. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/18/2021. (sk01)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Lee Mitchell Johnson. (lbc)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO U.S. MARSHAL DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT DEPUTY MCKAY Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING COMPLAINT granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that he need not prepay the full court filing fee or the cost for service of process. Plaintiff may pay the court filing fee in installments. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 to be paid to the Clerk of the Court as provided in this Order. The jail or prison having custody of Plaintiff shall make payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the full court filing fee of $350.00 is paid. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Amended Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Judge Aileen M. Cannon no longer assigned to case. (daa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee Mitchell Johnson. (dj)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. (dj)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against McKay.. IFP Filed, filed by Lee Mitchell Johnson.(dj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Mitchell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?