Trice v. Palm Beach County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Larry Darnel Trice and Larry Trice Darnel
Defendant: Palm Beach County Sheriff and Rick Bradshaw
Case Number: 9:2021cv81528
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Darnel Trice (Address Updated). (pcs)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350 [ECF No. #6 ]. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #6 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff need not prepay a partial filing fee in this case, or prepay costs such as for service of process. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available. The jail/prison having custody of Plaintiff must make payments from the prisoners account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Attachment to #7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Darnel Trice (pcs) Modified text to reflect correct designation as attachment (SEE #7 ). It is not an appendix per chambers on 9/24/2021 (daa).
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Darnel Trice (pcs)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Darnel Trice. (pcs)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF $402 FILING FEE OR APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ALONG WITH SUPPORTING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED without prejudice. On or before SEPTEMBER 30, 2021, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402.00 filing fee or shall complete and file the form application to proceed without payment offees attached to this Order. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (daa)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Darnel Trice. (daa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (daa)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Rick Bradshaw, Palm Beach County Sheriff. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Larry Darnel Trice.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trice v. Palm Beach County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Darnel Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Trice Darnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?