COGLEY v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: ADAM COGLEY
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 9:2021cv81855
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (ob)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by ADAM COGLEY (Auerbach, Jacob)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Upon sua sponte review of the record in this matter, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that by November 29, 2021, the parties shall conduct an informal settlement conference for a minimum of two (2) hours. A representative with settlement authority must attend the informal settlement conference or be available telephonically. The parties shall file a Joint Notice of Compliance and Status Report certifying compliance with this Order and providing a report on the status of discussions by NOON on November 29, 2021. Should the parties reach a resolution of this case through meeting and conferring prior to conducting the informal settlement conference, the parties shall promptly notify the Court that an informal settlement conference will no longer be necessary. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/2/2021. (ob)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Life Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant's response is due on or before November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/2/2021. (ob)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerson, Shari)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Correct Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant's response is due on or before November 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/20/2021. (ob)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Summons Returned Executed, TO CORRECT DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerson, Shari)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ADAM COGLEY. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Gallup, Dana)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (drz)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15059149, filed by ADAM COGLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Auerbach, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COGLEY v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM COGLEY
Represented By: Jacob Karl Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Shari Lyn Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?