Ramirez v. Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andy Ramirez
Defendant: Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc., LJ General Services, LLC, Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc. and Hartzell Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2021cv81863
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 24 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc. (Joshi, Nikhil)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/9/2021 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Logan Birken on behalf of LJ General Services, LLC. Attorney Shawn Logan Birken added to party LJ General Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Birken, Shawn)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Of Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 18, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc.. (Joshi, Nikhil)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Compliance with D.E. 14 by Andy Ramirez re #14 Order to Show Cause (Blumstein, Jake)
November 18, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Roof Painting by Hartzell, Inc by Andy Ramirez (Blumstein, Jake)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andy Ramirez. Hartzell Construction, Inc. served on 11/15/2021, response/answer due 12/6/2021. (Richards, Jordan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Hartzell Construction, Inc.. (kpe)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (AMENDED) by Andy Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Summons for Hartzell Construction, Inc.) (Blumstein, Jake)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Perfect Service. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ob)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc.. (Joshi, Nikhil)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nikhil Nalin Joshi on behalf of Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc.. Attorney Nikhil Nalin Joshi added to party Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc.(pty:dft). (Joshi, Nikhil)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ob)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to LJ General Services, LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/5/2021. (kpe)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to LJ General Services, LLC by Andy Ramirez. (Richards, Jordan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andy Ramirez. Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc. served on 10/19/2021, response/answer due 11/9/2021. (Richards, Jordan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Andy Ramirez (Blumstein, Jake)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andy Ramirez. LJ General Services, LLC served on 10/12/2021, response/answer due 11/2/2021. (Richards, Jordan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jake Slome Blumstein on behalf of Andy Ramirez (Blumstein, Jake)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc., Hartzell Construction, Inc., LJ General Services, LLC, Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc.. (kpe)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc., Hartzell Construction, Inc., LJ General Services, LLC, Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15064484, filed by Andy Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc., #3 Summon(s) as to LJ General Services, LLC, #4 Summon(s) as to Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc., #5 Summon(s) as to Hartzell Construction, Inc.)(Richards, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Ramirez
Represented By: Jake Slome Blumstein
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergence Employee Leasing II, Inc.
Represented By: Nikhil Nalin Joshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJ General Services, LLC
Represented By: Shawn Logan Birken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roof Painting By Hartzell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartzell Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?