Fleming v. V & M Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Fleming
Defendant: V & M Food Enterprises, LLC. a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as Golden Corral and Anthony Verderame
Case Number: 9:2021cv81867
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Joint Discovery Plan by Tammy Fleming.(Ventura, Chanelle)
November 18, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT REGARDING Settlement by Tammy Fleming (Ventura, Chanelle)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion. Good cause shown, the mediation conference scheduled for November 17, 2021 may proceed via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/16/2021. (jb02)
November 15, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for leave to conduct FLSA Settlement Conference via ZOOM by Tammy Fleming. (Ventura, Chanelle)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 Statement of Claim by Plaintiff by V & M Food Enterprises, LLC., Anthony Verderame. (Holbrook, Kelly)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial. The Calendar Call in this matter is RESCHEDULED from April 6, 2022, to April 1, 2022, at 1:15 p.m., in West Palm Beach, Florida. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by Tammy Fleming. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chanelle Ventura)(Ventura, Chanelle)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2021. Discovery due by 1/26/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/26/2022. Expert Discovery due by 1/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/19/2021. In Limine Motions due by 2/11/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2022. Motions due by 2/11/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/14/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 4/6/2022 at 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2021. The Court discussed the trial date, pretrial deadlines, motions to continue, sealing of documents, consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, mediation or settlement conferences, requirements if a settlement is reached and discovery issues and good faith conferral. Written scheduling order and order of referral to mediation will be issued. Total time in court: 12 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Chanelle Joy Ventura for Plaintiff, Kelly B. Holbrook for Defendants. (Digital 09:30:21) (kza)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 Statement of: Claim by Tammy Fleming (Ventura, Chanelle)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 9:30 AM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/29/2021. (no00)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tammy Fleming (Ventura, Chanelle)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by V & M Food Enterprises, LLC., Anthony Verderame (Holbrook, Kelly)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by V & M Food Enterprises, LLC., Anthony Verderame. (Holbrook, Kelly)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. Responses due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/6/2022 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tammy Fleming. (Ventura, Chanelle)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking #6 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Tammy Fleming by Tammy Fleming (Ventura, Chanelle)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 STRICKEN-SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tammy Fleming. Anthony Verderame served on 10/6/2021, response/answer due 10/27/2021. (Ventura, Chanelle) Modified text on 10/18/2021 (mee). Per d.e. #7 .
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tammy Fleming. V & M Food Enterprises, LLC. served on 10/6/2021, response/answer due 10/27/2021. (Ventura, Chanelle)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly B. Holbrook on behalf of V & M Food Enterprises, LLC., Anthony Verderame. Attorney Kelly B. Holbrook added to party V & M Food Enterprises, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly B. Holbrook added to party Anthony Verderame(pty:dft). (Holbrook, Kelly)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to V & M Food Enterprises, LLC and Anthony Verderame (jbs)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against V & M Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Golden Corral, Anthony Verderame. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15067514, filed by Tammy Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Notice Letter, #3 Summon(s) as to Corporate Defendant, #4 Summon(s) as to Individual Defendant)(Ventura, Chanelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. V & M Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Fleming
Represented By: Chanelle Joy Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V & M Food Enterprises, LLC. a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as Golden Corral
Represented By: Kelly B. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Verderame
Represented By: Kelly B. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?