Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Seery
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: William S Seery, Jr.
Case Number: 9:2021cv81874
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Robert Stevens for Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jao)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by William S Seery, Jr. See DE #9 for image (pes)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER/Response to Complaint by William S Seery, Jr. (pes)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2021., Discovery due by 3/24/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2021., In Limine Motions due by 4/7/2022., Motions due by 4/7/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/9/2022., Trial set for 6/6/2022 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2022 at 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2022 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. William S Seery, Jr served on 10/9/2021, response/answer due 11/1/2021. (D'Loughy, James)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (D'Loughy, James)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William S Seery, Jr. (jao)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William S Seery, Jr. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-15072055, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(D'Loughy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Seery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S Seery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?