Hernandez v. Osceola Farms Co. and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, District Lodge 166, Local Lodge 2152
Plaintiff: Luis Hernandez
Defendant: Osceola Farms Co. and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace : Workers, District Lodge 166, Local Lodge 2152
Case Number: 9:2021cv81875
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2021., Discovery due by 2/24/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2021., In Limine Motions due by 4/7/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2022., Motions due by 4/7/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/9/2022., Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2021. Plaintiff's counsel present and advised the Court that service has not been perfected yet.The Court asked Plaintiff'scounselto advise Defense counsel of this conference and the deadlines set. The Court discussed the trial date, pretrial deadlines, motions to continue, sealing of documents, consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, mediation or settlement conferences, requirements if a settlement is reached and discovery issues and good faith conferral. Written scheduling order and order of referral to mediation will be issuedTotal time in court: 11 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Robert T. Vance, Jr for Plaintiff. (Digital 15:41:11) (kza)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert T. Vance, Jr. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/16/2021. (kal)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert T. Vance, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15169598 by Luis Hernandez. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 3:40 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/1/2021. (jb02)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Luis Hernandez re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Osceola Farms Co. and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace : Workers, District Lodge 166, Local Lodge 2152. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15071819, filed by Luis Hernandez.(Davis, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Osceola Farms Co. and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, District Lodge 166, Local Lodge 2152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Hernandez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Davis
Represented By: Robert T. Vance, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola Farms Co. and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace : Workers, District Lodge 166, Local Lodge 2152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?