Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. DD Buffalo, LLC
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: DD Buffalo, LLC doing business as Buffalo Run Ranch
Case Number: 9:2021cv81878
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/16/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by DD Buffalo, LLC. Attorney W John Eagan added to party DD Buffalo, LLC(pty:dft). (Eagan, W)
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION To Set Aside/Vacate Clerk's Default re #9 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default Stipulation to Set Aside Default by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 VACATED PER DE #13 . Clerks Entry of Default as to DD Buffalo, LLC . Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/4/2021. (pcs) Modified on 11/16/2021 (lbc).
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to DD Buffalo, LLC by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default)(DeSouza, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. DD Buffalo, LLC served on 10/7/2021, response/answer due 10/28/2021. (D'Loughy, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (pcs)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DD Buffalo, LLC. (pcs)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DD Buffalo, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Run Ranch. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15072737, filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. f/k/a Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(D'Loughy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. DD Buffalo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: James D D'Loughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DD Buffalo, LLC doing business as Buffalo Run Ranch
Represented By: W John Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?