Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. v. Gimaex Holding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc.
Defendant: Gimaex Holding, Inc., Iturri Feuerwehr-und Umwelttechnik GmbH, Echelles Riffaud SA and Unknown Interpleader Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 9:2021cv81879
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Statement of: Waiver of Service of Summons from Iturri Feuerwehr-und Umwelttechnik GmbH filed by Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. (Topolski, Scott) Modified on 11/4/2021 (ir).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Echelles Riffaud SA, Gimaex Holding, Inc., Iturri Feuerwehr-und Umwelttechnik GmbH. (cds)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. re #1 Interpleader Complaint Filing Proposed Summonses for Named Interpleader Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons to Gimaex Holding, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to Iturri, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Echelles Riffaud) (Cole, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Shyft Group, Inc. for Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. (Cole, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 Interpleader Complaint Filing fees $402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-15073198, filed by Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc. v. Gimaex Holding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spartan Motors Global, Inc. n/k/a The Shyft Group Global, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gimaex Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iturri Feuerwehr-und Umwelttechnik GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echelles Riffaud SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Interpleader Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?