Baptiste v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Menasse Baptiste
Defendant: First Watch Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a First Watch Restaurant and First Watch Restaurants, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as First Watch Restaurant
Case Number: 9:2021cv82057
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/22 at 2:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/7/2022. (no00)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Scheduling Conference, and Setting Trial Date. ( Calendar Call set for 7/27/2022 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Menasse Baptiste (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remer, Jason)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nailah Donnaye Bowen on behalf of First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. Attorney Nailah Donnaye Bowen added to party First Watch Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bowen, Nailah)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Watch Restaurants, Inc., filed by Menasse Baptiste.(Hunt, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Watch Restaurants, Inc. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15166214, filed by First Watch Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptiste v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menasse Baptiste
Represented By: Daniel H. Hunt
Represented By: Jason Saul Remer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Watch Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a First Watch Restaurant
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Watch Restaurants, Inc. a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as First Watch Restaurant
Represented By: Mary Caroline Cravatta
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Represented By: Nailah Donnaye Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?