ERCOLANO v. CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Plaintiff: LISA ERCOLANO
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Case Number: 9:2021cv82484
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment A - Scheduling Timeline for Standard Track Cases)(Liro, Jacob)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Liro, Jacob)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS PHARMACY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Liro, Jacob)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/17/2021. (eca)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/17/2021. (eca)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney Brian Todd Scher has not been added to this case re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (pt)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15255411, filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC. (No Answer filed/No Motion to Dismiss filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Composite Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Holiday CVS LLC and CVS Pharmacy Fla. Div. of Corp. 2021 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal State Court)(Liro, Jacob) Text Modified on 12/17/2021 (scn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERCOLANO v. CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA ERCOLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Jacob J Liro
Represented By: Michael Leonard McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?