Astrove v. Doe
Plaintiff: Andrew Astrove
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 9:2022cv80614
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
June 15, 2022 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Evidentiary Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2022 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice to Defendant John Doe filed by Andrew Astrove. Witness Roman Bieda sworn and testified. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric F. Rosenberg, David Chad Silver, Jon-Jorge Aras, Daniel Kolber, Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
June 15, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE by Andrew Astrove of Filing Documents in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Silver, David)
June 2, 2022 Reset Hearings: The preliminary injunction zoom hearing is hereby rescheduled for 6/15/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Per 21 Order. (gp)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Court finds good cause to extend the #4 Temporary Restraining Order entered on April 22, 2022 against JOHN DOE past twenty-eight (28) days. "Although the explicit wording of Rule 65(b) seems to reject any contention that a temporary restraining order can continue beyond the one 14-day extension permitted by the rule, the history and purpose of temporary restraining orders support the argument that there may be situations in which a temporary restraining order may remain in effect beyond a total of 28 days." 2953 Temporary Restraining Orders-Duration and Modification, 11A Fed. Prac. & Proc. Civ. 2953 (3d ed.). Therefore, the #4 Temporary Restraining Order entered on April 22, 2022 against JOHN DOE is hereby extended through and including June 15, 2022 and shall remain in full force, except as set forth herein, until that time or upon further Order of this Court. The preliminary injunction hearing that was scheduled to take place on June 3, 2022 is hereby rescheduled. Defendant JOHN DOE shall appear via Zoom videoconference on June 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., before United States District Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II for a hearing at which Defendant JOHN DOE may show good cause why this Court should not enter a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/2/2022. (ob)
June 2, 2022 Filing 20 Third MOTION for Extension of Time of Amended Temporary Restraining Order re 17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,,, Order on Motion to Continue,,,,, #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Continue ( Responses due by 6/16/2022), MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ELECTRONICALLY SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS ABROAD. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Electronically Serve Non-Party Subpoenas Abroad by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
May 17, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings per DE 17 : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/3/2022 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. (pes)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Court finds good cause to extend the #4 Temporary Restraining Order entered on April 22, 2022 against JOHN DOE past twenty-eight (28) days. "Although the explicit wording of Rule 65(b) seems to reject any contention that a temporary restraining order can continue beyond the one 14-day extension permitted by the rule, the history and purpose of temporary restraining orders support the argument that there may be situations in which a temporary restraining order may remain in effect beyond a total of 28 days." 2953 Temporary Restraining Orders-Duration and Modification, 11A Fed. Prac. & Proc. Civ. 2953 (3d ed.). Therefore, the #4 Temporary Restraining Order entered on April 22, 2022 against JOHN DOE is hereby extended through and including June 3, 2022 and shall remain in full force, except as set forth herein, until that time or upon further Order of this Court. The preliminary injunction hearing that was scheduled to take place on May 20, 2022 is hereby rescheduled. Defendant JOHN DOE shall appear via Zoom videoconference on June 3, 2022 at 1:00 p.m., before United States District Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II for a hearing at which Defendant JOHN DOE may show good cause why this Court should not enter a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/17/2022. (ob)
May 17, 2022 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time of Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Continue ( Responses due by 5/31/2022), MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
May 16, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings per DE 15 **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/20/2022 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. (pes)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling the preliminary injunction hearing set for Friday, May 20, 2022 - TIME CHANGE ONLY. The May 20, 2022 hearing will take place at 10:30 A.M. via Zoom. The Zoom hearing can be accessed at # click here. Meeting ID: 161 713 2744 - Passcode: 606702 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/16/2022. (ob)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
May 3, 2022 Set Hearing per DE #12 : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/20/2022 at 3:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. (pes)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER MODIFYING AND EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESCHEDULING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
May 2, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Modify and Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Rescheduling Preliminary Injunction Hearing re #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, , MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing ( Responses due by 5/16/2022) by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CANCELLING ZOOM HEARING. As discussed at today's 9 telephonic status conference, the hearing set for tomorrow, May 3, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/2/2022. (ob)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/2/2022. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric F. Rosenberg, David Chad Silver, Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, 954-769-5448 / ellen_rassie@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER setting telephonic status conference for today, Monday, May 2, 2022 at 3:00 P.M.The parties are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 by no later than 2:55 P.M. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918. The Court requires that the parties appear via a landline (i.e., not a cellular phone or a speaker phone) if possible for clarity. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/2/2022. (ob)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for attorney Eric F. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/29/2022. (ob)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER providing Zoom instructions for the Tuesday, May 3, 2022 hearing at 10:00 A.M. This hearing will take place via Zoom. The Zoom hearing can be accessed at # click here. Meeting ID: 160 466 0824 - Passcode: 204911 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/29/2022. (ob)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric F. Rosenberg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15600868 by Andrew Astrove. Responses due by 5/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Eric F. Rosenberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice to Defendant John Doe by Andrew Astrove. Responses due by 5/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Astrove, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, David)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against John Doe. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15576516, filed by Andrew Astrove. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astrove v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Astrove
Represented By: David Chad Silver
Represented By: Jason Stuart Miller
Represented By: Eric F. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?