Horton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tamara R. Horton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 9:2022cv80770
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 . Chicago-based attorney Frederick J. Daley, Jr., Esq. may appear and participate in this action as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiff. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all e-filings to Mr. Daley at fdaley@fdaleylaw.com. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/1/2022. (jrz)
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frederick J. Daley, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15663491 by Tamara R. Horton. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Berger, Erik)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Frederick J. Daley, Jr., mailing date May 24, 2022, (pt)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pc)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Report and Recommendation. (pc)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pc)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15659095, filed by Tamara R. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara R. Horton
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?