Lozada v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Julio Alberto Lozada
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 9:2022cv80867
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mee)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Julio Alberto Lozada (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney, #2 Proposed Summons as to Office of Chief Regional Counsel, #3 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney General) (Brady, Daniel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. Plaintiff may proceed without paying the filing fee. However, I will not direct the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant with process. Instead, upon Plaintiff's counsels request [1-3], it will be Plaintiff's responsibility to properly serve Defendant with the appropriate summons and copies of the Complaint in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Plaintiff shall promptly file the Returns of Service. Defendant shall answer the Complaint within sixty (60) days of the service of process date, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/14/2022. (osd)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julio Alberto Lozada. (swr)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (swr)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Julio Alberto Lozada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 In Forma Pauperis)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Brady, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lozada v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Alberto Lozada
Represented By: Daniel J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?