Palm Beach Concourse, LLC v. Supercar Week Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Concourse, LLC
Defendant: Supercar Week Inc. and Neil London
Case Number: 9:2022cv80888
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC. Replies due by 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Klingsberg, Debra)
July 29, 2022 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC (Kramer, George)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (DE #16 ) is August 2, 2022. Plaintiff seeks a 7-day extension of this deadline, citing the personal circumstances of its counsel. Based on the representations contained in the Motion, I find good cause to grant the brief extension requested. Accordingly, Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (DE #16 ) is extended to August 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/29/2022. (jnk)
July 29, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint . Responses due by 8/9/2022. PER DE# 18 (cds)
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC. (Kramer, George)
July 19, 2022 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous #1 Complaint , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Neil London, Supercar Week Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2022 (Alba, Dawn)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2022., Discovery due by 12/29/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 9/8/2022., In Limine Motions due by 1/12/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2023., Motions due by 1/12/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/13/2023., Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/8/2023 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 PAPERLESS Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Scheduling Conference held on 07/15/2022. The Court discussed whether parties would be added, the trial period, pretrial deadlines, motions to continue, sealing of documents, consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, mediation or settlement conferences, requirements if a settlement is reached. Written scheduling order and order of referral to mediation will be issued. Total time in court: 26 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Debra Daumit Klingsberg, Dawn Marie Alba. (Digital 16:01:09) (kza)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is July 7, 2022. Defendants seek an extension of this deadline until July 19, 2022, citing the personal circumstances of one Defendant and the fact that counsel was recently retained. I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to July 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/5/2022. (jnk)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Neil London, Supercar Week Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alba, Dawn)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Marie Alba on behalf of Neil London, Supercar Week Inc.. Attorney Dawn Marie Alba added to party Neil London(pty:dft), Attorney Dawn Marie Alba added to party Supercar Week Inc.(pty:dft). (Alba, Dawn)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 4:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed two (2) business days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Motions to modify the trial date must specifically state the basis for the request, including detailed factual support, and must provide a compelling reason. The parties are further advised that the Court is strongly disinclined to modify the trial date based upon the scheduling "tracks" contained within the Local Rules and/or based upon vague references to the complexities of the case. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/28/2022. (no00)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/8/2023 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for William Matthewman for Scheduling Conference with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC. Supercar Week Inc. served on 6/16/2022, response/answer due 7/7/2022. (Kramer, George)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC. Neil London served on 6/16/2022, response/answer due 7/7/2022. (Kramer, George)
June 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC re #1 Complaint (Kramer, George)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jua)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Neil London, Supercar Week Inc. (jua)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jua)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15720378, filed by Palm Beach Concourse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(Kramer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Beach Concourse, LLC v. Supercar Week Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Concourse, LLC
Represented By: George William Kramer
Represented By: Debra Daumit Klingsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supercar Week Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Marie Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil London
Represented By: Dawn Marie Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?