Richmond et al v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: TERRY L RICHMOND, Alexander Schultz and Terry L. Richmond
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 9:2022cv81374
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Ryon M McCabe
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, MOTION for Summary Judgment , #9 Statement, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Declaration of Michelle Christ) (Raurell, Carlos)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 Statement of: Material Facts by Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Raurell, Carlos)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Responses due by 11/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Appendix Exhibit A to Declaration in Support of Motion)(Raurell, Carlos)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting Defendant's Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action ("Motion") #6 . After reviewing the record and the pertinent statute, 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(C), the Court finds good cause to grant the Defendant's Motion. The Defendant shall respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 8, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 10/12/2022. (mw00)
October 12, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe for appropriate disposition or Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) Lissette Labrousse, ALJ on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (jas)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jas)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15928035, filed by TERRY L RICHMOND, Alexander Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Death Certificates, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Counsel Atlanta, #4 Summon(s) Attorney General DC, #5 Summon(s) US Atty WPB, #6 Summon(s) ALJ Fort Lauderdale)(Schultz, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond et al v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY L RICHMOND
Represented By: Alexander Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Schultz
Represented By: Alexander Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L. Richmond
Represented By: Alexander Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?