Louden Broadway Properties, LLC v. Swig et al
Plaintiff: Louden Broadway Properties, LLC
Defendant: Kent M. Swig, HSI Holdings, LLC, Dignity Gold, LLC and Dignity Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 9:2022cv81448
Filed: September 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 Verified ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Dignity Gold, LLC, Dignity Holdings, LLC, HSI Holdings, LLC, Kent M. Swig. (Lett, Enjolique)
October 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enjolique Aytch Lett on behalf of Dignity Gold, LLC, Dignity Holdings, LLC, HSI Holdings, LLC, Kent M. Swig. Attorney Enjolique Aytch Lett added to party Dignity Gold, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Enjolique Aytch Lett added to party Dignity Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Enjolique Aytch Lett added to party HSI Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Enjolique Aytch Lett added to party Kent M. Swig(pty:dft). (Lett, Enjolique)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants seek a two-week extension of their deadline to Answer the complaint, stating that they require more time to "fully address and analyze the various allegations." Motions for extension of time must set forth good cause supported by specific facts. The basis for the requested relief is not well-explained and the motion does not provide me with sufficient facts to discern whether good cause exists. Nevertheless, because the motion is unopposed, I will grant the requested relief in part. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/17/2022. (kal)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Dignity Gold, LLC, Dignity Holdings, LLC, HSI Holdings, LLC, Kent M. Swig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillenwater, James)
October 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Evans Gillenwater on behalf of Dignity Gold, LLC, Dignity Holdings, LLC, HSI Holdings, LLC, Kent M. Swig. Attorney James Evans Gillenwater added to party Dignity Gold, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Evans Gillenwater added to party Dignity Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Evans Gillenwater added to party HSI Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Evans Gillenwater added to party Kent M. Swig(pty:dft). (Gillenwater, James)
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dignity Holdings, LLC. (pcs)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Dignity Holdings, LLC by Louden Broadway Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons to Dignity Holdings, LLC) (Gershman, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued for Dignity Holdings, LLC. A Summons for this party was not filed. Two Summons were filed for Dignity Gold, LLC. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (swr)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dignity Gold, LLC, HSI Holdings, LLC, Kent M. Swig. (swr)
September 18, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
September 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15957143, filed by Louden Broadway Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Credit Line Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex B - 25th Modification Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Forbearance Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Apri 15 2020 Note, #5 Exhibit Ex E - June 11 2020 Note, #6 Exhibit Ex F - March 11 2020 Note, #7 Exhibit Ex G - April 15 2020 Note, #8 Exhibit Ex H - June 1 2020 Note, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Aug 31 2020 Note, #10 Exhibit Ex J - Swig Guaranty of CLLA, #11 Exhibit Ex K - Swig Guaranty of $500K Note, #12 Exhibit Ex L - Swig Guaranty of $265K Note, #13 Exhibit Ex M - Swig Guaranty of March 5 2020 Note, #14 Exhibit Ex N - Swig Guaranty of April 15 2020 Note, #15 Exhibit Ex O - Swig Guaranty of June 1 2020 Note, #16 Exhibit Ex P - Swig Guaranty of Aug 31 2020 Note, #17 Exhibit Ex Q - Dignity Guaranty of March 5 2020 Note, #18 Exhibit Ex R - Dignity Guaranty of April 15 2020 Note, #19 Exhibit Ex S - Dignity Guaranty of June 1 2020 Note, #20 Exhibit Ex T - Dignity Guaranty of Aug 31 2020 Note, #21 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Summon(s) Summons - Kent M Swig, #23 Summon(s) Summons - HSI Holdings LLC, #24 Summon(s) Summons - Dignity Gold LLC, #25 Summon(s) Summons - Dignity Holdings LLC)(Gershman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louden Broadway Properties, LLC v. Swig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louden Broadway Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert Scott Gershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent M. Swig
Represented By: James Evans Gillenwater
Represented By: Enjolique Aytch Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSI Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Evans Gillenwater
Represented By: Enjolique Aytch Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Gold, LLC
Represented By: James Evans Gillenwater
Represented By: Enjolique Aytch Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James Evans Gillenwater
Represented By: Enjolique Aytch Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?